Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Motor Vehicle Rentals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB0600)
Title
Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Electronic Credentials (Maryland Mobile ID Enhancement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464 (SB0863)
Title
Motor Vehicles – Rental Fleet Vehicles – Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 (HB1226)
Title
Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization of Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1464)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Rental Fleet Vehicles - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1226 (SB0600) Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Electronic Credentials (Maryland Mobile ID Enhancement Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1464 (SB0863) Motor Vehicles – Rental Fleet Vehicles – Registration Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0600 (HB1226) Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization of Pilot Program Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 (HB1464) Motor Vehicles - Rental Fleet Vehicles - Registration Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2025 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page