Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0519)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0508 (SB0265/CH0509)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 /CH0525
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0698)
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000 /CH0511
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 /CH0686 (SB0820)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB0467)
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Payment of Commissions and Attorney’s Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0513 (SB0700)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0509 (HB0301/CH0508)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 (HB1264)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0203)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0938)
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB1266/CH0513)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1261/CH0686)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 (SB0519) Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0301 /CH0508 (SB0265/CH0509) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Delegate Shetty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0347 Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0681 /CH0525 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0766 Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0870 Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 (SB0698) Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1000 /CH0511 Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement Delegate Pippy 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB1261 /CH0686 (SB0820) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1264 (SB0467) Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Payment of Commissions and Attorney’s Fees Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1266 /CH0513 (SB0700) Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0265 /CH0509 (HB0301/CH0508) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0467 (HB1264) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0203) Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 (HB0938) Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0700 (HB1266/CH0513) Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0820 (HB1261/CH0686) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page