Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0851)
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 (SB0253)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610
Title
Estates - Execution of a Will - Witness Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 (SB0446)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Trusts - Decanting (Maryland Trust Decanting Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0792)
Title
Estates and Trusts – Registered Domestic Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0769)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Real Property - Disclaimed Property and Exemptions From Prepayment
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0146)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0210)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282 (SB0195)
Title
Orphans’ Court Judges – Election
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 (HB0986)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer–on–Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195 (HB1282)
Title
Orphans’ Court Judges – Election
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB1240)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0244)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 (HB0687)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Trusts - Decanting (Maryland Trust Decanting Act)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683
Title
Courts – Wrongful Acts by Deceased Individuals – Actions In Rem
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB0865)
Title
Baltimore City – Residential Real Property – Disclaimed Property and Exemptions From Prepayment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB0755)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registered Domestic Partnerships
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB0018)
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0851) Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Alterations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
1/19/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0244 (SB0253) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0610 Estates - Execution of a Will - Witness Requirements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 (SB0446) Estates and Trusts - Trusts - Decanting (Maryland Trust Decanting Act) Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0755 (SB0792) Estates and Trusts – Registered Domestic Partnerships Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0865 (SB0769) Baltimore City - Residential Real Property - Disclaimed Property and Exemptions From Prepayment Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 (SB0146) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1240 (SB0210) Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1282 (SB0195) Orphans’ Court Judges – Election Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0146 (HB0986) Maryland Real Property Transfer–on–Death (TOD) Act Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
SB0195 (HB1282) Orphans’ Court Judges – Election Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 (HB1240) Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 (HB0244) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 (HB0687) Estates and Trusts - Trusts - Decanting (Maryland Trust Decanting Act) Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 Courts – Wrongful Acts by Deceased Individuals – Actions In Rem Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 (HB0865) Baltimore City – Residential Real Property – Disclaimed Property and Exemptions From Prepayment Senator Carter 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB0755) Estates and Trusts - Registered Domestic Partnerships Senator West 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0851 (HB0018) Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Alterations Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 12:52 PM
Click to return on the top page