Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0315 (SB0075/CH0314)
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0319 (SB0080/CH0318)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359
Title
Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0201 (SB0116/CH0200)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 (SB0023)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 (SB0759)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption and Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068 /CH0190 (SB0577/CH0189)
Title
Income Tax - Opportunity for Filers to Register to Make Anatomical Gift
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Exclusion of Inherited Property
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0677)
Title
Orphans’ Court Judges – Elections
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0314 (HB0324/CH0315)
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0318 (HB0326/CH0319)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0200 (HB0528/CH0201)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 /CH0189 (HB1068/CH0190)
Title
Income Tax - Opportunity for Filers to Register to Make Anatomical Gift
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0698)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0294 Estates and Trusts - Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0324 /CH0315 (SB0075/CH0314) Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 /CH0319 (SB0080/CH0318) Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0359 Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0201 (SB0116/CH0200) Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0677 (SB0023) Orphans' Court Judges - Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0698 (SB0759) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption and Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1068 /CH0190 (SB0577/CH0189) Income Tax - Opportunity for Filers to Register to Make Anatomical Gift Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1258 Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Exclusion of Inherited Property Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1518 Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 (HB0677) Orphans’ Court Judges – Elections Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0075 /CH0314 (HB0324/CH0315) Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0080 /CH0318 (HB0326/CH0319) Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
SB0116 /CH0200 (HB0528/CH0201) Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0577 /CH0189 (HB1068/CH0190) Income Tax - Opportunity for Filers to Register to Make Anatomical Gift Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
SB0759 (HB0698) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2024 11:50 AM
Click to return on the top page