Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0151)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0450)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 /CH0169
Title
Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0645
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 /CH0295 (SB0318/CH0296)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168)
Title
Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0925)
Title
Workgroup on Public Water Access
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0082)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318 /CH0296 (HB1134/CH0295)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 (HB0631)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB1267)
Title
Workgroup on Public Water Access
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Closed Against Entry
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 (SB0151) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0458 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0631 (SB0450) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0800 /CH0169 Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 /CH0645 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1025 Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1134 /CH0295 (SB0318/CH0296) Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168) Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1267 (SB0925) Workgroup on Public Water Access Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0151 (HB0082) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0318 /CH0296 (HB1134/CH0295) Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0450 (HB0631) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167) Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0925 (HB1267) Workgroup on Public Water Access Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Closed Against Entry Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page