Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654
Title
Back River and Patapsco Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Quality Testing and Overflow and Pipeline Breakage Notification (Environmental Accountability Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings (Cameras in the Courtroom Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844
Title
Real Property Tax Rates - Notification to Real Property Taxpayers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962 /CH0502 (SB0643/CH0503)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475 (SB1003)
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice - Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation - Online Newspapers
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0503 (HB0962/CH0502)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 /CH0203
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 /CH0373 (HB1115)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003 (HB1475)
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0334 Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0654 Back River and Patapsco Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Quality Testing and Overflow and Pipeline Breakage Notification (Environmental Accountability Act of 2022) Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0810 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings (Cameras in the Courtroom Act of 2022) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0844 Real Property Tax Rates - Notification to Real Property Taxpayers Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 /CH0502 (SB0643/CH0503) Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1475 (SB1003) Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice - Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation - Online Newspapers Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0031 Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0643 /CH0503 (HB0962/CH0502) Commercial Law - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0673 /CH0203 Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0771 /CH0373 (HB1115) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1003 (HB1475) Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page