Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Notaries Public

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0964 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page