Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Notaries Public

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0519)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 /CH0686 (SB0820)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB0735)
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 /CH0125
Title
Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0126
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 /CH0649
Title
State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0203)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735 (HB1265)
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1261/CH0686)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 (SB0519) Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1261 /CH0686 (SB0820) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1265 (SB0735) State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1360 State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0132 /CH0125 Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0212 /CH0126 State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0360 /CH0649 State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0519 (HB0203) Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 (HB1265) State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0820 (HB1261/CH0686) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page