Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Notaries Public

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0176 (SB0036/CH0177)
Title
Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036 /CH0177 (HB0576/CH0176)
Title
Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0576 /CH0176 (SB0036/CH0177) Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0036 /CH0177 (HB0576/CH0176) Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page