Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Consumer Protection - Robocalls and Spam Calls - Website to Report and Annual Report
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0450)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Real Property – Nuisance Actions – Rodent Harborage
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0004)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0121
Title
Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 (HB0631)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Consumer Protection - Robocalls and Spam Calls - Website to Report and Annual Report Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0253 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0515 Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0631 (SB0450) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1093 Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1282 Real Property – Nuisance Actions – Rodent Harborage Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HJ0001 (SJ0004) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
Rules
SB0350 Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0352 /CH0121 Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0450 (HB0631) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SJ0004 (HJ0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2021 - 9:45 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page