Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0711 (SB0253/CH0712)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Landis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0407)
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Audit
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 /CH0689 (SB0720/CH0690)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312)
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0840)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0296 (SB0984)
Title
Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Health Data Utility
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241
Title
Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0761)
Title
Funding for Wage Increases for Medical Provider Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414 (SB0153)
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB1414)
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 /CH0712 (HB0353/CH0711)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 (HB0407)
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 /CH0690 (HB1034/CH0689)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 (HB1350)
Title
Funding for Wage Increases for Medical Provider Workers
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311)
Title
Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1084)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909
Title
Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984 (HB1127/CH0296)
Title
Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Health Data Utility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0216 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0353 /CH0711 (SB0253/CH0712) Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments Delegate Landis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0407 (SB0407) Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0747 Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Audit Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1034 /CH0689 (SB0720/CH0690) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312) Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1084 (SB0840) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1127 /CH0296 (SB0984) Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Health Data Utility Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB1241 Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1350 (SB0761) Funding for Wage Increases for Medical Provider Workers Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1351 Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1414 (SB0153) Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0153 (HB1414) Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 /CH0712 (HB0353/CH0711) Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0407 (HB0407) Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0677 Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0720 /CH0690 (HB1034/CH0689) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0761 (HB1350) Funding for Wage Increases for Medical Provider Workers Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311) Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0840 (HB1084) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0909 Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 (HB1127/CH0296) Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Health Data Utility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:17 PM
Click to return on the top page