Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nursing Homes -see also- AsstLiving; ContinCare; LTCare

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0076)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403 (SB0443)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0328)
Title
Funding for Wages and Benefits for Nursing Home Workers (Nursing Home Staffing Crisis Funding Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0712)
Title
State–Owned Nursing Homes – Deficiencies, Citations, and Fines – Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB1000)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Nursing Homes – Acquisitions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0813)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Access to Telephones
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Environment - Crematory - Setback Requirements and Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Licensure, Indoor Use, and Taxation - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475 (SB0825)
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 (HB0068)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0462)
Title
Funding for Wages and Benefits for Nursing Home Workers (Nursing Home Staffing Crisis Funding Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0403)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712 (HB0938)
Title
State-Owned Nursing Homes - Deficiencies, Citations, and Fines - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1253)
Title
Health Care Facilities – Access to Telephones
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1475)
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Nursing Homes
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1122)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 (SB0076) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0403 (SB0443) End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 (SB0328) Funding for Wages and Benefits for Nursing Home Workers (Nursing Home Staffing Crisis Funding Act of 2024) Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 (SB0712) State–Owned Nursing Homes – Deficiencies, Citations, and Fines – Reporting Requirements Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1122 (SB1000) Maryland Health Care Commission – Nursing Homes – Acquisitions Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1177 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1253 (SB0813) Health Care Facilities - Access to Telephones Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Environment - Crematory - Setback Requirements and Permits Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 Electronic Smoking Devices - Licensure, Indoor Use, and Taxation - Alterations Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
HB1475 (SB0825) Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 (HB0068) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0328 (HB0462) Funding for Wages and Benefits for Nursing Home Workers (Nursing Home Staffing Crisis Funding Act of 2024) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0403) End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 (HB0938) State-Owned Nursing Homes - Deficiencies, Citations, and Fines - Reporting Requirements Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1253) Health Care Facilities – Access to Telephones Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB1475) Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Nursing Homes Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1122) Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:29 PM
Click to return on the top page