Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 /CH0362 (SB0913/CH0363)
Title
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0255
Title
Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 /CH0638 (SB0392/CH0639)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies – Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786
Title
Department of Human Services, Maryland Department of Health, and Department of Education - Easing Access to Family Support Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0640)
Title
Emergency Community Services Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945 /CH0380 (SB0907/CH0381)
Title
Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0453 (SB0846/CH0454)
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0807)
Title
Commission on Men and Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0844)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0639 (HB0606/CH0638)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0935)
Title
Emergency Community Services Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1156)
Title
Commission on Men and Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1281)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0454 (HB0969/CH0453)
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 /CH0381 (HB0945/CH0380)
Title
Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0363 (HB0101/CH0362)
Title
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 /CH0362 (SB0913/CH0363) Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0189 /CH0255 Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0568 Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0606 /CH0638 (SB0392/CH0639) Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Economic Matters
1/29/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0757 Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies – Feminine Hygiene Products Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0786 Department of Human Services, Maryland Department of Health, and Department of Education - Easing Access to Family Support Programs Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0935 (SB0640) Emergency Community Services Fund Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 /CH0380 (SB0907/CH0381) Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 380
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0969 /CH0453 (SB0846/CH0454) Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1076 Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1156 (SB0807) Commission on Men and Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act) Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1281 (SB0844) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0392 /CH0639 (HB0606/CH0638) Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0640 (HB0935) Emergency Community Services Fund Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1156) Commission on Men and Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act) Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0844 (HB1281) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0454 (HB0969/CH0453) Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 454
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0907 /CH0381 (HB0945/CH0380) Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0913 /CH0363 (HB0101/CH0362) Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page