Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 (SB0232)
Title
Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration and Receipt of Benefits and Use at Automated Teller Machines
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0417 (SB0230/CH0418)
Title
Human Services – Local Departments of Social Services – Audits
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0343 (SB0400/CH0344)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Transportation Companies - Regulation (Preventing Abduction in Youth Transport Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 /CH0370 (SB0445/CH0371)
Title
Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 /CH0500 (SB0347/CH0499)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigations and Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801
Title
Maryland Financial Empowerment Center Network Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Spiegel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 /CH0373 (SB0703)
Title
Family Investment Program - Child Support
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0294 (SB0674/CH0293)
Title
Maryland Commission for Women - Maryland Collaborative to Advance Implementation of Coverage of Over-the-Counter Birth Control
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Maryland College Aid Processing System - Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402
Title
Maryland Department of Health and Department of Human Services – Public Benefits – Prevention of Waste, Fraud, and Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 /CH0418 (HB0251/CH0417)
Title
Human Services - Local Departments of Social Services - Audits
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 (HB0175)
Title
Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration and Receipt of Benefits and Use at Automated Teller Machines
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0499 (HB0542/CH0500)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigations and Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0344 (HB0497/CH0343)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Transportation Companies - Regulation (Preventing Abduction in Youth Transport Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 /CH0371 (HB0538/CH0370)
Title
Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0288
Title
Maryland Community Action Agencies - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0293 (HB0939/CH0294)
Title
Maryland Commission for Women - Maryland Collaborative to Advance Implementation of Coverage of Over-the-Counter Birth Control
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB0881/CH0373)
Title
Family Investment Program - Child Support
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 (SB0232) Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration and Receipt of Benefits and Use at Automated Teller Machines Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0251 /CH0417 (SB0230/CH0418) Human Services – Local Departments of Social Services – Audits Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Appropriations
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0497 /CH0343 (SB0400/CH0344) Residential Child Care Programs - Transportation Companies - Regulation (Preventing Abduction in Youth Transport Act of 2025) Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Judiciary
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0538 /CH0370 (SB0445/CH0371) Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Appropriations
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0542 /CH0500 (SB0347/CH0499) Adult Protective Services - Investigations and Disclosure of Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Judiciary
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0801 Maryland Financial Empowerment Center Network Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Spiegel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 /CH0373 (SB0703) Family Investment Program - Child Support Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Appropriations
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 /CH0294 (SB0674/CH0293) Maryland Commission for Women - Maryland Collaborative to Advance Implementation of Coverage of Over-the-Counter Birth Control Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1090 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Maryland College Aid Processing System - Applications Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 Maryland Department of Health and Department of Human Services – Public Benefits – Prevention of Waste, Fraud, and Abuse Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0230 /CH0418 (HB0251/CH0417) Human Services - Local Departments of Social Services - Audits Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Finance
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0232 (HB0175) Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration and Receipt of Benefits and Use at Automated Teller Machines Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0347 /CH0499 (HB0542/CH0500) Adult Protective Services - Investigations and Disclosure of Information Senator Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0400 /CH0344 (HB0497/CH0343) Residential Child Care Programs - Transportation Companies - Regulation (Preventing Abduction in Youth Transport Act of 2025) Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Finance
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
SB0445 /CH0371 (HB0538/CH0370) Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Finance
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 /CH0288 Maryland Community Action Agencies - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0674 /CH0293 (HB0939/CH0294) Maryland Commission for Women - Maryland Collaborative to Advance Implementation of Coverage of Over-the-Counter Birth Control Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Finance
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0703 (HB0881/CH0373) Family Investment Program - Child Support Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Finance
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2025 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page