Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 (SB0511)
Title
Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731 (SB0505)
Title
Department of Aging - Dementia Care Coordinator and Dementia Care Navigation Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 /CH0689 (SB0720/CH0690)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312)
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0227
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0731)
Title
Department of Aging - Dementia Care Coordinator and Dementia Care Navigators
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0430)
Title
Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 /CH0690 (HB1034/CH0689)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311)
Title
Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0430 (SB0511) Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Zucker)
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0731 (SB0505) Department of Aging - Dementia Care Coordinator and Dementia Care Navigation Programs Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1034 /CH0689 (SB0720/CH0690) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Delegate Kelly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312) Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0175 /CH0227 Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 (HB0731) Department of Aging - Dementia Care Coordinator and Dementia Care Navigators Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0430) Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0720 /CH0690 (HB1034/CH0689) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0743 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311) Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:22 PM
Click to return on the top page