Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0033 (SB0212/CH0034)
Title
Department of Aging – Aging Services – Program Repeal and Consolidation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0035 (SB0223/CH0036)
Title
Department of Aging - Senior Call-Check and Social Connections Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0037 (SB0205/CH0038)
Title
Human Services - Adult Protective Services
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 /CH0370 (SB0445/CH0371)
Title
Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0465)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Video Recordings
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 /CH0331
Title
Continuing Care Providers - Governing Bodies - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Maryland Department of Aging - Continuing Care Retirement Communities and Continuing Care At-Home Providers Licensing and Regulation - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0038 (HB0246/CH0037)
Title
Human Services - Adult Protective Services
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0034 (HB0036/CH0033)
Title
Department of Aging - Aging Services - Program Repeal and Consolidation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 /CH0036 (HB0158/CH0035)
Title
Department of Aging - Senior Call-Check and Social Connections Program
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 /CH0371 (HB0538/CH0370)
Title
Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0576)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Video Recordings
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 /CH0033 (SB0212/CH0034) Department of Aging – Aging Services – Program Repeal and Consolidation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0158 /CH0035 (SB0223/CH0036) Department of Aging - Senior Call-Check and Social Connections Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0246 /CH0037 (SB0205/CH0038) Human Services - Adult Protective Services Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Judiciary
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0538 /CH0370 (SB0445/CH0371) Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Appropriations
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0576 (SB0465) Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Video Recordings Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 /CH0331 Continuing Care Providers - Governing Bodies - Membership Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Maryland Department of Aging - Continuing Care Retirement Communities and Continuing Care At-Home Providers Licensing and Regulation - Study Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0205 /CH0038 (HB0246/CH0037) Human Services - Adult Protective Services Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0212 /CH0034 (HB0036/CH0033) Department of Aging - Aging Services - Program Repeal and Consolidation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Finance
1/22/2025 - 3:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 /CH0036 (HB0158/CH0035) Department of Aging - Senior Call-Check and Social Connections Program Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
1/22/2025 - 3:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 /CH0371 (HB0538/CH0370) Department of Human Services - Federal Commodity Supplemental Food Program - Administration Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Finance
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 (HB0576) Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Video Recordings President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:53 PM
Click to return on the top page