Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 /CH0520 (SB0147)
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0038
Title
Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of Directors
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0022/CH0520)
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 /CH0520 (SB0147) Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0038 Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of Directors Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 (HB0022/CH0520) Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page