Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 /CH0420 (SB0208/CH0419)
Title
Human Services - Maryland Assistive Technology Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 (SB0157)
Title
Maryland Disability Service Animal Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 /CH0347 (SB0603/CH0348)
Title
University of Maryland, College Park Campus - TerpsEXCEED Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Wolek
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Meetings - Secondary Transition Planning Materials
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 /CH0001 (SB0433)
Title
Office of Disability Employment Advancement and Policy and Maryland as a Model Employer Initiative - Established
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 (SB0851)
Title
Public Schools - Individuals With Disabilities - Accessibility and Emergency Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Task Force to Study Fencing for Bodies of Water and Playgrounds - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 /CH0393
Title
Disability Services - Adapted Vehicle Access Pilot Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 (HB0384)
Title
Maryland Disability Service Animal Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 /CH0419 (HB0214/CH0420)
Title
Human Services - Maryland Assistive Technology Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 (HB0502/CH0001)
Title
Office of Disability Employment Advancement and Policy and Maryland as a Model Employer Initiative - Established
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0348 (HB0458/CH0347)
Title
University of Maryland, College Park Campus – TerpsEXCEED Program – Funding
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700
Title
Notarial Acts - Reasonable Accommodations
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB0694)
Title
Public Schools - Individuals With Disabilities - Main Entrance Accessibility and Emergency Planning
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0214 /CH0420 (SB0208/CH0419) Human Services - Maryland Assistive Technology Program - Establishment Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Appropriations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0384 (SB0157) Maryland Disability Service Animal Program - Established Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0458 /CH0347 (SB0603/CH0348) University of Maryland, College Park Campus - TerpsEXCEED Program - Funding Delegate Wolek 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Appropriations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0464 Special Education - Individualized Education Program Meetings - Secondary Transition Planning Materials Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0502 /CH0001 (SB0433) Office of Disability Employment Advancement and Policy and Maryland as a Model Employer Initiative - Established Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Appropriations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0694 (SB0851) Public Schools - Individuals With Disabilities - Accessibility and Emergency Planning Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0756 Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Task Force to Study Fencing for Bodies of Water and Playgrounds - Established Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 11:30 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2025 - 11:30 AM
HB1481 /CH0393 Disability Services - Adapted Vehicle Access Pilot Program - Established Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2025 - 11:30 AM
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 (HB0384) Maryland Disability Service Animal Program - Established Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
1/15/2025 - 10:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0208 /CH0419 (HB0214/CH0420) Human Services - Maryland Assistive Technology Program - Establishment Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Finance
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0433 (HB0502/CH0001) Office of Disability Employment Advancement and Policy and Maryland as a Model Employer Initiative - Established President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0603 /CH0348 (HB0458/CH0347) University of Maryland, College Park Campus – TerpsEXCEED Program – Funding Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 Notarial Acts - Reasonable Accommodations Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0851 (HB0694) Public Schools - Individuals With Disabilities - Main Entrance Accessibility and Emergency Planning Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:55 PM
Click to return on the top page