Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 /CH0722 (SB0299/CH0723)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 /CH0243 (SB0436/CH0244)
Title
Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931
Title
Child Care Providers - Notice of Allegations of Child Abuse or Neglect (Aiden's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944 /CH0437 (SB0711/CH0438)
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0481 (SB0520/CH0482)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0244 (HB0597/CH0243)
Title
Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0482 (HB1243/CH0481)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 /CH0438 (HB0944/CH0437)
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0392 Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0548 /CH0722 (SB0299/CH0723) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0568 Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0597 /CH0243 (SB0436/CH0244) Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0931 Child Care Providers - Notice of Allegations of Child Abuse or Neglect (Aiden's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0944 /CH0437 (SB0711/CH0438) Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established Delegate Solomon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1243 /CH0481 (SB0520/CH0482) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1307 Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act) Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0436 /CH0244 (HB0597/CH0243) Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
SB0520 /CH0482 (HB1243/CH0481) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0711 /CH0438 (HB0944/CH0437) Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page