Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383
Title
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 /CH0225 (SB0922)
Title
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047
Title
Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249 (SB0766)
Title
State Board of Elections and Local Boards of Elections - Membership and Staff
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Mail-In Voting - Certification of Assistance, Design of Materials, and Ballot Curing
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers' Performance Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289
Title
Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1249)
Title
State Board of Elections and Local Boards of Elections - Membership and Staff
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB0756/CH0225)
Title
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lam
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0367 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0383 Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0756 /CH0225 (SB0922) Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1047 Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 (SB0766) State Board of Elections and Local Boards of Elections - Membership and Staff Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1345 Mail-In Voting - Certification of Assistance, Design of Materials, and Ballot Curing Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0260 Public Safety - Police Officers' Performance Review Board Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0289 Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0766 (HB1249) State Board of Elections and Local Boards of Elections - Membership and Staff Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0922 (HB0756/CH0225) Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse Senator Lam 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page