Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0530)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0374)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – 9–1–1 Specialists
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569 (SB0418)
Title
Energy Generation, Transmission, and Storage Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 (HB0439)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - 9-1-1 Specialists
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0569)
Title
Energy Generation Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0431)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0431 (SB0530) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0374) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – 9–1–1 Specialists Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0569 (SB0418) Energy Generation, Transmission, and Storage Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 (HB0439) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - 9-1-1 Specialists Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0569) Energy Generation Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0530 (HB0431) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/21/2022 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page