Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Occupational Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0779
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0390
Title
State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 /CH0779 Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
SB0239 /CH0390 State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice – Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Finance
1/18/2024 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page