Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0609)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB1022 (SB0609) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page