Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0208
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Instructors - Expressions of Opinion
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0208 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Instructors - Expressions of Opinion Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page