Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 /CH0856
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0771
Title
Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 /CH0028 (SB0459/CH0029)
Title
Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Election Law - Incarcerated Individuals - Voting Eligibility and Access (Voting Rights for All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172
Title
Federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program - Employee Certification and Awareness Materials
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - People's Counsel for Land Use Planning PG/MC 112-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Ombudsman Unit, Governing Document Database, and Local Commissions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0029 (HB0418/CH0028)
Title
Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 /CH0856 Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 856
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0054 /CH0771 Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0243 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0418 /CH0028 (SB0459/CH0029) Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1022 Election Law - Incarcerated Individuals - Voting Eligibility and Access (Voting Rights for All Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1172 Federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program - Employee Certification and Awareness Materials Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB1177 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1364 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - People's Counsel for Land Use Planning PG/MC 112-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1457 Common Ownership Communities - Ombudsman Unit, Governing Document Database, and Local Commissions Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 836
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0459 /CH0029 (HB0418/CH0028) Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page