Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Opioids -see also- Controlled Dangerous Substances; Drugs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0282)
Title
Correctional Services - Local Detention Centers - Reporting on Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411 /CH0850 (SB0408/CH0849)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Reports on Standing Orders and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
St. Mary's County - Board of Education - Civil Rights Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0497)
Title
Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products (NARCAN Price Cap Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
Criminal Law – Money Laundering
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 /CH0852 (SB0751/CH0851)
Title
Public Health - Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0801)
Title
Correctional Services - Medication-Assisted Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Public Health - Overdose Prevention Site Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Public Health - Opioids and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs - Information
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 /CH0885 (SB1071/CH0886)
Title
Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 /CH0748
Title
Public Health - Kratom Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB1075)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Causing Serious Bodily Injury or Death (Victoria and Scottie's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Tomlinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Educational Institutions – Opioid Overdose–Reversing Medications – Policy Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380
Title
Calvert County - Board of Education - Civil Rights Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 (HB0203)
Title
Correctional Services - Local Detention Centers - Reporting on Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 /CH0849 (HB0411/CH0850)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Reports on Standing Orders and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0736)
Title
Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 /CH0851 (HB0980/CH0852)
Title
Public Health – Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB1031)
Title
Correctional Services – Medication–Assisted Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071 /CH0886 (HB1155/CH0885)
Title
Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075 (HB1245)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Causing Serious Bodily Injury or Death (Victoria and Scottie's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1099 /CH0764
Title
Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 (SB0282) Correctional Services - Local Detention Centers - Reporting on Opioid Use Disorder Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0411 /CH0850 (SB0408/CH0849) Maryland Department of Health - Reports on Standing Orders and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 850
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0519 St. Mary's County - Board of Education - Civil Rights Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Morgan, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0736 (SB0497) Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products (NARCAN Price Cap Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 Criminal Law – Money Laundering Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 /CH0852 (SB0751/CH0851) Public Health - Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 852
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1031 (SB0801) Correctional Services - Medication-Assisted Treatment Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1094 Public Health - Overdose Prevention Site Pilot Program Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1121 Public Health - Opioids and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs - Information Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
HB1155 /CH0885 (SB1071/CH0886) Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 885
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB1229 /CH0748 Public Health - Kratom Consumer Protection Act Delegate Jones, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 (SB1075) Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Causing Serious Bodily Injury or Death (Victoria and Scottie's Law) Delegate Tomlinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 Educational Institutions – Opioid Overdose–Reversing Medications – Policy Requirements Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1380 Calvert County - Board of Education - Civil Rights Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 (HB0203) Correctional Services - Local Detention Centers - Reporting on Opioid Use Disorder Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 /CH0849 (HB0411/CH0850) Maryland Department of Health - Reports on Standing Orders and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 849
Finance
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0497 (HB0736) Health Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Opioid Reversal Drugs and Products Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0751 /CH0851 (HB0980/CH0852) Public Health – Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund – Revisions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 851
Finance
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0801 (HB1031) Correctional Services – Medication–Assisted Treatment Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB1071 /CH0886 (HB1155/CH0885) Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 886
Finance
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1075 (HB1245) Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Causing Serious Bodily Injury or Death (Victoria and Scottie's Law) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1099 /CH0764 Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 764
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page