Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Optometrists, Ophthalmologists, and Opticians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0779
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 /CH0814 (SB0175/CH0815)
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Primary and Secondary Students - Vision and Hearing Studies and Evaluations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
Optometrists - Prescriptions for Glasses and Contact Lenses - Pupillary Distance Measurement
Sponsor
Delegate Stonko
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0815 (HB0381/CH0814)
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 /CH0391
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 /CH0779 Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0381 /CH0814 (SB0175/CH0815) State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 814
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0893 Primary and Secondary Students - Vision and Hearing Studies and Evaluations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 Optometrists - Prescriptions for Glasses and Contact Lenses - Pupillary Distance Measurement Delegate Stonko 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 /CH0815 (HB0381/CH0814) State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Criminal History Records Checks Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 815
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 /CH0391 State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Finance
1/18/2024 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page