Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Optometrists, Ophthalmologists, and Opticians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657
Title
Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Public Schools - Health and Vision Services - Required Screenings and Eye Examinations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0657 Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 Public Schools - Health and Vision Services - Required Screenings and Eye Examinations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page