Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 (SB0022)
Title
Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660
Title
Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB1029)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0315)
Title
Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 (HB0868)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0315 (SB0022) Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0550 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 (SB1029) Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 (HB0315) Task Force to Study Fiduciary Adjudication in Maryland Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1029 (HB0868) Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law) Senator Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 10:18 AM
Click to return on the top page