Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Overtime

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 (SB0124)
Title
Employment Standards – Firefighters – Payment of Wages and Payroll Information
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582
Title
Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438
Title
Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Behler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 (HB0205)
Title
Employment Standards - Firefighters - Payment of Wages and Payroll Information
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 (HB0015)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Worker Cooperative Association Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 (SB0124) Employment Standards – Firefighters – Payment of Wages and Payroll Information Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Appropriations
1/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0582 Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional Capacity Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Crosby) Adopted
Economic Matters
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional Capacity Delegate Behler 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
SB0124 (HB0205) Employment Standards - Firefighters - Payment of Wages and Payroll Information Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Finance
1/16/2025 - 3:00 PM
SB0144 (HB0015) Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Worker Cooperative Association Act) Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2025 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2025 8:51 AM
Click to return on the top page