Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265 (SB0006)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Public Ethics - Gifts and Lobbyist Registration (Public Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Legislative Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0619)
Title
No Representation Without Population Act – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031
Title
General Assembly - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002
Title
Resolution to End the State of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HS0001
Title
Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0265)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0827)
Title
No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644
Title
State Officials - Appointments - Advice and Consent of the Senate
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0109
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 /CH0110
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SS0001
Title
Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID–19
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0265 (SB0006) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0292 Public Ethics - Gifts and Lobbyist Registration (Public Integrity Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0653 Joint Committee on Workforce Development Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0725 Constitutional Amendment - Legislative Sessions Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0827 (SB0619) No Representation Without Population Act – Repeal Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1031 General Assembly - Term Limits Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0002 Resolution to End the State of Emergency Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0005 United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0006 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HS0001 Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID–19 Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - First Reading
SB0006 (HB0265) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
SB0357 Joint Committee on Workforce Development Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0619 (HB0827) No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0644 State Officials - Appointments - Advice and Consent of the Senate Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0773 Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
3/05/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0877 /CH0109 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0878 /CH0110 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SS0001 Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID–19 President 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page