Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0063)
Title
General Assembly - Residency Requirement - Enforcement - Factors
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346
Title
Department of Information Technology - Oversight of Legislative Branch Information Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348
Title
General Assembly and Legislative Branch of State Government - Security Training - Protecting Security-Sensitive Data
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
General Assembly - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Legislation - Spending Mandates - Three-Fifths Vote and Limited Duration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0508 (SB0785)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
General Assembly - Use of Force - Required Training Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0002/JR0001)
Title
Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution – Amendments Convention – Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0009)
Title
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 /JR0006 (SJ0011/JR0007)
Title
Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HS0001
Title
Articles of Impeachment of Governor Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr.
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0320)
Title
General Assembly – Residency Requirement – Enforcement – Factors
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0134
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 /CH0135
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB1023/CH0508)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 /JR0001 (HJ0002)
Title
Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0009 (HJ0007)
Title
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsor
Minority Leader
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0011 /JR0007 (HJ0008/JR0006)
Title
Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SS0001
Title
Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID-19
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0320 (SB0063) General Assembly - Residency Requirement - Enforcement - Factors Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 Department of Information Technology - Oversight of Legislative Branch Information Technology Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 General Assembly and Legislative Branch of State Government - Security Training - Protecting Security-Sensitive Data Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 General Assembly - Term Limits Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
HB0976 Legislation - Spending Mandates - Three-Fifths Vote and Limited Duration Requirement Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
HB1023 /CH0508 (SB0785) Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1220 General Assembly - Use of Force - Required Training Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
HJ0002 (SJ0002/JR0001) Legislative Districting Plan of 2022 Speaker 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0006 (SJ0008) United States Constitution – Amendments Convention – Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
HJ0007 (SJ0009) General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0008 /JR0006 (SJ0011/JR0007) Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine Delegate Reznik 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
Rules
HS0001 Articles of Impeachment of Governor Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr. Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
SB0063 (HB0320) General Assembly – Residency Requirement – Enforcement – Factors Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0073 General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0226 /CH0134 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0406 /CH0135 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0785 (HB1023/CH0508) Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 /JR0001 (HJ0002) Legislative Districting Plan of 2022 President 6 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Reapportionment and Redistricting
1/18/2022 - 3:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0008 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SJ0009 (HJ0007) General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations Minority Leader 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0011 /JR0007 (HJ0008/JR0006) Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine Senator Hough 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 7
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SS0001 Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID-19 President 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:04 PM
Click to return on the top page