Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pandemics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0496 (SB0448/CH0497)
Title
Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424 (SB0782)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1424)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB0734/CH0023)
Title
Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - Alterations and Appropriation (Maryland Student Investment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0685 /CH0496 (SB0448/CH0497) Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1424 (SB0782) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 (HB1424) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 (HB0734/CH0023) Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - Alterations and Appropriation (Maryland Student Investment Act) Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page