Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0144)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0242)
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480
Title
Vehicle Laws – Plug–In Electric Drive Vehicles – Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Reclamation Hours
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Charges and Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 (HB0110)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0116)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388
Title
Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0110 (SB0144) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0116 (SB0242) Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0480 Vehicle Laws – Plug–In Electric Drive Vehicles – Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0483 Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Reclamation Hours Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1330 Vehicle Laws - Towing Charges and Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1374 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 (HB0110) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0242 (HB0116) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0315 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0388 Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page