Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 /CH0418
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371 (SB0246)
Title
Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 (SB0731)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0417
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 (HB0371)
Title
Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB0870)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860 (HB1039)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0157 /CH0418 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0371 (SB0246) Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0870 (SB0731) Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1146 Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 /CH0417 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0246 (HB0371) Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0731 (HB0870) Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 (HB1039) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page