Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Patients

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0703 (SB0453/CH0704)
Title
Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598 /CH0322 (SB0413/CH0323)
Title
Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 /CH0960
Title
Right to Try Act - Individualized Investigational Treatments
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0347)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143 /CH0844
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Maryland Emergency Department Wait Time Reduction Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1103/CH0142)
Title
Hospitals and Related Institutions - Outpatient Facility Fees
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB1020)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Training and Clinical Staffing Committees and Plans (Safe Staffing Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate White Holland
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Recovery Levels of Care - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0923 (HB0084/CH0922)
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0790)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 /CH0323 (HB0598/CH0322)
Title
Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1103 /CH0142 (HB1149)
Title
Hospitals and Related Institutions – Outpatient Facility Fees
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1175
Title
Hospitals - Emergency Medical Conditions - Procedures (Maryland Lifesaving Treatment Access and Abortion Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0576 /CH0703 (SB0453/CH0704) Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0598 /CH0322 (SB0413/CH0323) Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition Delegate Boafo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0676 /CH0960 Right to Try Act - Individualized Investigational Treatments Delegate Morgan, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 960
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 (SB0347) Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 /CH0844 Emergency Medical Services - Maryland Emergency Department Wait Time Reduction Commission - Establishment Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 844
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 (SB1103/CH0142) Hospitals and Related Institutions - Outpatient Facility Fees Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1194 (SB1020) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Training and Clinical Staffing Committees and Plans (Safe Staffing Act of 2024) Delegate White Holland 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1396 Maryland Department of Health - Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Recovery Levels of Care - Study Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0923 (HB0084/CH0922) Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law) Senator Lewis Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 923
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0790) Medical Cannabis - Employees in Health Care Settings Caring for Qualifying Patients Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 /CH0323 (HB0598/CH0322) Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1006 Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-20)
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1103 /CH0142 (HB1149) Hospitals and Related Institutions – Outpatient Facility Fees President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1175 Hospitals - Emergency Medical Conditions - Procedures (Maryland Lifesaving Treatment Access and Abortion Protection Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/22/2024 9:44 AM
Click to return on the top page