Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 /CH0443 (SB0981)
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0880)
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 (SB0552)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis Plan – Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Public Schools - Crossing Guards - Hiring and Budget Allocation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0695)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB0656)
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB0546/CH0443)
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0546 /CH0443 (SB0981) Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0880) Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022 Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0695 (SB0552) Environment – Climate Crisis Plan – Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
SB0238 Public Schools - Crossing Guards - Hiring and Budget Allocation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 (HB0695) Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0880 (HB0656) Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022 Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 (HB0546/CH0443) Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page