Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Perjury

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Certificates of Birth – Issuance of New Certificates – Sex Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 107-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Restriction of Bidders
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 Certificates of Birth – Issuance of New Certificates – Sex Designation Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0390 /CH0287 (SB0447/CH0288) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Economic Matters
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 107-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0447 /CH0288 (HB0390/CH0287) Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0980 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Restriction of Bidders Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page