Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH0547 (SB0700/CH0546)
Title
Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restricted Use
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 /CH0546 (HB0621/CH0547)
Title
Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792
Title
Business Regulation - Lodging Establishments - Bedbug Remediation
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0621 /CH0547 (SB0700/CH0546) Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of Fees Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1285 Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restricted Use Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environmental Matters
SB0700 /CH0546 (HB0621/CH0547) Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of Fees Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 Business Regulation - Lodging Establishments - Bedbug Remediation Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page