Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pharmacists and Pharmacies -see also- Drugs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 (SB0018)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0332)
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 (SB0246)
Title
Public Health - Nonoccupational Postexposure Prophylaxis (nPEP) Standing Order Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Membership - Veterinary Pharmacist
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403 (SB0443)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB1009)
Title
Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0626)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056 (SB0986)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Public Health - Opioids and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs - Information
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 (HB0076)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 (HB0127)
Title
Public Health - Nonoccupational Postexposure Prophylaxis (nPEP) Standing Order Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 (HB0084)
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0403)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0726)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786
Title
Task Force on Access to Pharmacy Services and the Impact of Telepharmacy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1056)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 (SB0018) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0084 (SB0332) Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law) Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0087 Criminal Law - Death Penalty Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 (SB0246) Public Health - Nonoccupational Postexposure Prophylaxis (nPEP) Standing Order Program - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0149 Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 State Board of Pharmacy - Membership - Veterinary Pharmacist Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0403 (SB0443) End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0548 (SB1009) Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances Delegate Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0726 (SB0626) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1056 (SB0986) State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution Delegate Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1121 Public Health - Opioids and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs - Information Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0018 (HB0076) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 (HB0127) Public Health - Nonoccupational Postexposure Prophylaxis (nPEP) Standing Order Program - Establishment Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 (HB0084) Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law) Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0403) End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 (HB0726) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0786 Task Force on Access to Pharmacy Services and the Impact of Telepharmacy in Maryland Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 (HB1056) State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 10:46 AM
Click to return on the top page