Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 (SB0234)
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0269 (SB0429/CH0270)
Title
For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564
Title
Montgomery County – Automated Traffic Enforcement – Implementing Agency MC 04–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619 /CH0447
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Residential Districts PG 302-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 /CH0450
Title
Prince George's County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems PG 305-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Briggs Chaney Road PG 303-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 /CH0139 (SB0569)
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0863)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109
Title
Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0023)
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0250
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404
Title
State Government – Websites – Required Information
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0270 (HB0558/CH0269)
Title
For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 (HB0730/CH0139)
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1082)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 (SB0234) Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act) Delegate Stein 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
1/27/2021 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0284 Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0381 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0558 /CH0269 (SB0429/CH0270) For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0564 Montgomery County – Automated Traffic Enforcement – Implementing Agency MC 04–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 /CH0447 Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Residential Districts PG 302-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 447
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 /CH0450 Prince George's County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems PG 305-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 450
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Briggs Chaney Road PG 303-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0730 /CH0139 (SB0569) Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1082 (SB0863) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
HB1109 Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0234 (HB0023) Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0256 /CH0250 Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0404 State Government – Websites – Required Information Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0429 /CH0270 (HB0558/CH0269) For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0569 (HB0730/CH0139) Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals President 3 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0863 (HB1082) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page