Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Piers and Docks -see also- Marinas; Ports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 (SB0876)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0081
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1309)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0237 (HB0028/CH0236)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1309 (SB0876) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 /CH0081 Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB1309) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
SB0939 /CH0237 (HB0028/CH0236) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page