Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Plastics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700
Title
Environment – Products and Packaging – Labeling, Marketing, and Advertising for Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 Environment – Products and Packaging – Labeling, Marketing, and Advertising for Recycling Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
HB1070 Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 9:55 AM
Click to return on the top page