Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921
Title
Baltimore County – Sewer Service Charge – Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0738)
Title
Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB0982)
Title
Income Tax - Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0302 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0921 Baltimore County – Sewer Service Charge – Adjustment Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0982 (SB0738) Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0738 (HB0982) Income Tax - Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page