Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Baltimore County - Sewer Service Charge - Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0598
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0140
Title
Public Safety - Natural Gas and Liquefied Propane Piping Systems - Construction Requirements (Flynn and Laird Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0588)
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193 /CH0124
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB1165)
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0333 Baltimore County - Sewer Service Charge - Adjustment Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0526 /CH0598 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1052 /CH0140 Public Safety - Natural Gas and Liquefied Propane Piping Systems - Construction Requirements (Flynn and Laird Act) Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 (SB0588) Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 /CH0124 State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 (HB1165) Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:08 PM
Click to return on the top page