Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152
Title
Public Advocate Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Election Law - Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0500/CH0194)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Republican Party Central Committee – Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721
Title
Election Law - Political Clubs
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0485)
Title
Orphans’ Court Judges – Election and Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0989)
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0879)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 /CH0194 (HB0683)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Republican Party Central Committee - Elections
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1172)
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 Public Advocate Act of 2022 Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB0160 Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibition Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Election Law - Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0336 Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0683 (SB0500/CH0194) Anne Arundel County – Republican Party Central Committee – Elections Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0721 Election Law - Political Clubs Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 (SB0485) Orphans’ Court Judges – Election and Restriction on Practicing Law Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1172 (SB0989) Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 (HB0879) Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Restriction on Practicing Law Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 /CH0194 (HB0683) Anne Arundel County - Republican Party Central Committee - Elections Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0989 (HB1172) Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:23 AM
Click to return on the top page