Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0369 (SB1052)
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 (HB0396/CH0369)
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and Parole Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 /CH0369 (SB1052) Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law) Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB1052 (HB0396/CH0369) Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law) Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page