Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0835 (SB0113/CH0834)
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145
Title
Criminal Law - Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 /CH0773 (SB0391/CH0772)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Extortion, Stalking, and Revenge Porn - Statute of Limitations and In Banc Review
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 (SB0355)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 (SB0382)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Prohibitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0834 (HB0099/CH0835)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0671)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0672)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0772 (HB0544/CH0773)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Extortion, Stalking, and Revenge Porn - Statute of Limitations and In Banc Review
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858
Title
Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0835 (SB0113/CH0834) Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 835
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0145 Criminal Law - Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808) Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 809
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0544 /CH0773 (SB0391/CH0772) Criminal Law - Sexual Extortion, Stalking, and Revenge Porn - Statute of Limitations and In Banc Review Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0671 (SB0355) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 (SB0382) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Prohibitions and Penalties Senator James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0834 (HB0099/CH0835) Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography - Prohibition Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 834
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0671) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 10:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2024 - 10:30 AM
SB0382 (HB0672) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0772 (HB0544/CH0773) Criminal Law - Sexual Extortion, Stalking, and Revenge Porn - Statute of Limitations and In Banc Review Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 772
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2024 - 10:30 AM
Judiciary
SB0858 Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page