Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Power of Attorney

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0827 (SB0230/CH0828)
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 /CH0828 (HB0090/CH0827)
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 /CH0827 (SB0230/CH0828) Insurance - Hearing Representation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0230 /CH0828 (HB0090/CH0827) Insurance - Hearing Representation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 828
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page