Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0744)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600
Title
Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0757 (HB1158)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0532)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0532 (SB0744) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0757 (HB1158) Clean Energy Jobs Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0744 (HB0532) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0886 Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page